+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 736
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 785
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 726
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 717
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 715 Amendment Cc109b
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 764
- Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 764
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 762 Amendment cc109b
- House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 748
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 739 Amendment Cc109a
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 699
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 689 Amendment Cc109a
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 727
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 668
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 691
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 691 Amendment 109ma
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 658
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 109na
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 470
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 452
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 439
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 389
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 109ga
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 190
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2015: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2015: Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor