+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 688
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 781
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 675
- Signed by President S.J. 673
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 758
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 756 Amendment Cc108
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 666
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 657 Amendment Cc108
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 744
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 641
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 702 Amendment 108jd
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 702
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 108jtb
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 677
- State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 108jb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 575
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 465
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 426
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 108ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 154
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2014: House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 7
March 13, 2014: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
February 24, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor