+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 640
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 559
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 491
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 511
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 454
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 359
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 300
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 272
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 128
+ − Votes (3)
February 16, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
February 14, 2012: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 7, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor