+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 618
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 29. H.J. 789
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 730
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 468
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 345
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 345 Amendment 107sa
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 321
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 306
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 295
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 282
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 259
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 163
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2016: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 18, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor