+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 672
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 624
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 605
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 575
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 603
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 543
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 314
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 265
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 224
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 106ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 128
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2012: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2012: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2012: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2012: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1