+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 644
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 563
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 542
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 525
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 280
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 298
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 276
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 178
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2011: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor