+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2018 S.J. 756
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2018 S.J. 736
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 646
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 5. H.J. 636
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 595
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 254
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 274
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 219
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 105ka
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 175
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 26, 2018: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
January 30, 2018: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 24, 2018: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor