+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 644
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 660
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 540
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 512
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 580
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 545
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 516
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 410
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 103oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 339
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 246
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 221
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 131
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 3, 2014: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
February 26, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2014: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2014: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor