+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 408
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 378
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 470
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 349
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 425
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 405
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 385
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House & committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 360
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 267
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 243
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 150
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2016: Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
February 8, 2016: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor