+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 670
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 618
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 610
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 566
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 160
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 140
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 118
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 21
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 27, 2019: Education Do Pass, Passed
January 22, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor