+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 505
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 413
- Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 413 Amendment HCR6005G
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HCR6005A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 227
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 16. H.J. 269
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Committee assignment waived H.J. 255
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 114
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 4, 2020: Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed
March 2, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 12, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor