+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 552
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 529
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 479
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 10. H.J. 521
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 499
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 4, 2014: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2014: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor