+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 620
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 336
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 336 Amendment c1013xa
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced S.J. 321
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 395
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 379
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2016: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2016: Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 16, 2016: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (77)
Type:
Primary Sponsor