+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 484
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 260
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 319
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 281
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2016: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2016: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor