+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 357
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 246 Amendment c1005ja
- Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 246
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced S.J. 232
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 3. H.J. 276
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 251
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2016: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
February 8, 2016: Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2016: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor