+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 10. S.J. 237
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 220
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced S.J. 198
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 10. H.J. 149
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced H.J. 128
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2013: Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2013: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 10
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor