+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 530
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 450
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 493
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 379
- Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 378 Amendment HJR5003C
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 278
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 297
- Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 296 Amendment HJR5003B
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
- Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HJR5003A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2021: Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 493
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 17. S.J. 379
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 17
March 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 16, 2021: Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 296 Amendment HJR5003B
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 12. H.J. 297
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor