+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 778
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 777
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 732
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 728
- Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed S.J. 728 Amendment j1006fa
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 684
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 582
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 11. H.J. 559
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 509
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j1006oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 200
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2018: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 6, 2018: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 5, 2018: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
February 22, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 21, 2018: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor