+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 661
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 587
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 615
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 539
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 510
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 480
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 407
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 445
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 405
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 161
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2012: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2012: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
February 13, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor