+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 0. S.J. 477
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2.
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 436
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 10. H.J. 470
- House of Representatives Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 18. H.J. 469 Amendment HCR6020A
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 452
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 439
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 420
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 401
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2020: Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed
March 9, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2020: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: House of Representatives Motion to amend resolution, Passed
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor