+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 5. S.J. 436
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 416
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 366
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 399
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 333