+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 31. H.J. 410
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 410 Amendment 1282C
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 381
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3.
- Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1282A
- Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 255
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 209
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 36, NAYS 31. H.J. 410
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 3
February 22, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1