+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 15, NAYS 19. S.J. 466
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 455
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1277G
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 367
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 412
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- State Affairs Deferred to another day, Passed
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1277C
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 257
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 210
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 26, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor