+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 536
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed, YEAS 59, NAYS 8. H.J. 603
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 554
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 546
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 464
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 461 Amendment 1266C
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1266A
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 385
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 18. H.J. 431
- Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 24. H.J. 421
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
- Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 6.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 242
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 210
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2020: House of Representatives Conference Committee report not adopted, no committee appointed, Passed
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed
March 4, 2020: State Affairs Tabled, Passed
February 27, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 27, 2020: Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Passed
February 26, 2020: Judiciary Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed
February 26, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Failed
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor