+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 H.J. 761
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 681
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 710
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 653
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 562
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 368
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 377
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 338
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 265
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2019: Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
February 12, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 8, 2019: House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor