+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2018 H.J. 747
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 749
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 689
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 9. S.J. 673
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 628
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 557
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 526
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 473
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1258wa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation, Passed H.J. 293
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 248