+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 1, 2019 H.J. 596
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 527
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 485
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 463
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 430
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 437
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. H.J. 405
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 327
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 281
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 264
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 14, 2019: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor