+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2018 H.J. 794
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 759
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on 2:50 p.m., March 8, 2018. H.J. 747
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 737
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 681
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 638
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248wc
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 596
- Placed on consent, Passed
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 486
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 437
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 395
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248oa
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1248ka
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 247
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2018: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
February 28, 2018: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 26, 2018: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 14, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor