+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 305
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 334
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 242
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 210