+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 881
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 860
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 787
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 504
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 468
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1238oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 361
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 446
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 408
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 289
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2016: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 29, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 17, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor