+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 446
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 373
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 356
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 316
- Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234yb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Taxation H.J. 280
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 259
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2019: House Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed
February 7, 2019: Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor