+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 843
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 837
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 745
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 815
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 759
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 650 Amendment 1234JTA
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 650
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 630
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234jb
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234ja
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 575
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 487
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 3. H.J. 440
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 367
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1234ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 213
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2013: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 26, 2013: Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor