+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 874
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 807
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 528
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 501
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 429
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 648
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 647 Amendment 1224ma
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 458
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 286
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 2, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor