+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 790
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 787
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 684
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 781
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 767
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 762 Amendment Cc1213
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 668
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 662 Amendment Cc1213
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 748
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 646
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 620
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 620 Amendment 1213tc
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 602
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 562
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 510
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 367
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 436
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Taxation Title amended, Passed Amendment 1213ftb
- Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 0. H.J. 370
- Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1213fb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 265
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
March 13, 2014: House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 70
March 13, 2014: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 3, 2014: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2014: Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor