+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 7. S.J. 664
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 632
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 607
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 600
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 538
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 11. H.J. 553
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 4. H.J. 530
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 462
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 459
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 255
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2019: Senate Tabled, Passed
February 26, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 25, 2019: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
February 21, 2019: Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor