+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 800
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 797
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 797
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 733
- First read in Senate S.J. 733
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 9. H.J. 796
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 734
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208dk
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208nc
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208nu
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208ao
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208gr
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208di
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208mt
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208nw
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208md
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208gq
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208ar
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208ms
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208dj
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208gs
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208dh
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208as
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208gm
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 15, NAYS 3. Amendment 1208gl
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208mv
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208aa
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208ap
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208aj
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208at
- Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. Amendment 1208nx
- Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. J.J. 786
- Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. J.J. 786
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 284
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House H.J. 262
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2015: Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 9
March 11, 2015: Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed
- Yeas: 18
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor