+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 456
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 436
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 241
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 10, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor