+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2017 H.J. 762
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 710
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 716
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 664
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 637
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 616
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 557
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 505
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 414
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2017: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2017: Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
February 16, 2017: House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor