+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 293
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 317
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 5, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor