+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 478
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 434
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 359
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 391
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 330
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 250
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 275
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 177
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 330
- Yeas: 35
February 22, 2021: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Yeas: 7
February 10, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 275
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2021: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor