+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 790
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 780
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 673
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 773
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 744
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 613
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 583
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1194tb
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 482
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 535
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 516
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation Title amended, Passed Amendment 1194fta
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 466
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1194fb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 247
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 12, 2014: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 10, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 9
February 25, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2014: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor