+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 881
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 860
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 548
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 500
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 429
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 649 Amendment 1190sa
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 649
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 458
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1190yb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair, Passed
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1190ya
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 256
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 7, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 19, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor