+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 842
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 735
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 655
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 598
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 614
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 575
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 486
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 0. H.J. 438
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 400
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1187tb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair, Passed
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 185
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
February 26, 2013: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
February 19, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 10
February 14, 2013: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor