+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 865
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 555
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 744
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 479
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 463
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 441
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 421
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 405
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 371
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 333
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 293
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 366
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 311
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 255
+ − Votes (3)
February 29, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
February 18, 2016: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 10, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor