+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 761
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 615
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 560
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 567
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 544
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 538
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 481
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 291
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 256
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 202
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1180oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 169
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 20, 2013: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
January 30, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2013: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor