+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2020 H.J. 462
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 405
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 444
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 367
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 206
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 256
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98