+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 14, NAYS 19. S.J. 586
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 586 Amendment 1171fb
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Title amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. Amendment 1171fta
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 498
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1171fa
- Health and Human Services Reconsidered, Passed
- Health and Human Services Removed from table, Passed
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 433
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 279
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 27. H.J. 299
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 20. H.J. 298 Amendment 1171jd
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 264
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 213
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1171jc
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1171jb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 154
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2012: Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2012: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2012: Health and Human Services Title amended, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 15, 2012: Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2012: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 4
February 2, 2012: House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor