+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 630
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 H.J. 538
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 470
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 419
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 293
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 26. H.J. 316
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1169B
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1169A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 3, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 13, 2020: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor