+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 504
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 418
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1166A
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 338
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 368
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98