+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 864
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 555
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 744
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 476
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 447
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 307
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 382
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 354
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 216
+ − Votes (4)
February 29, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 25, 2016: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (94)
Type:
Primary Sponsor